Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROTHERFIELD AND BROOK SURGERIES

Charity number: 802475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.03k £5.48k £16.30k £5.26k £5.25k
Total expenditure £9.25k £3.15k £8.88k £6.28k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A