SOCIETY FOR EARLY MODERN FRENCH STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by the promotion and encouragement of the study of the culture and history of France in the seventeenth century by means of the holding of meetings, by publications and by other means as may be deemed proper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 January 1990: Standard registration
- SOCIETY FOR SEVENTEENTH-CENTURY FRENCH STUDIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Emily Butterworth | Chair | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Claussen | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Moriarty | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
katherine Stratton | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Veronique Desnain | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr David McCallam | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jerome Brillaud | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helena Taylor | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Herdman | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rowan Tomlinson | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Horsley | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NOEL A PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.08k | £14.70k | £10.03k | £15.62k | £20.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.38k | £11.21k | £2.85k | £14.92k | £18.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 11TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE STUDY OF THE CULTURE AND HISTORY OF FRANCE IN THE EARLY MODERN PERIOD BY MEANS OF THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS, BY PUBLICATIONS AND BY OTHER MEANS AS MAY BE DEEMED PROPER. .
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of Exeter
Department of LCVS
Queens Building
The Queens Drive
EXETER
EX4 4QH
- Phone:
- 01628778060
- Email:
- h.taylor@exeter.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window