Financial history THE INSTITUTE OF AGRICULTURAL MANAGEMENT

Charity Number: 802635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £84.33k £176.82k £161.08k £181.18k £170.24k
Total expenditure £91.10k £126.88k £136.73k £166.22k £171.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A