THE INSTITUTE OF AGRICULTURAL MANAGEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support education and agricultural matters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 January 1990: Standard registration
- CENTRE OF MANAGEMENT IN AGRICULTURE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Price | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Andrew Jonathon Brown JP | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|||||
John Alexander Balfour | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Haley | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wiiliam Oliver | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jones | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Scott | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Elizabeth Russell Hall | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Allison Yearsley | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Redman | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Suthern | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matt Lobley | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Louis Brunt | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY GILES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY DAVID ALEXANDER BRIGSTOCKE MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.26k | £84.33k | £176.82k | £161.08k | £181.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.41k | £91.10k | £126.88k | £136.73k | £166.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 26 August 2020 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 26 August 2020 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26.11.1987 AS AMENDED 23.11.1989 AND 11.9.1998. as amended on 03 Oct 2019 as amended on 26 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE AND BUSINESS OF MANAGEMENT IN AGRICULTURE. (2) TO PROMOTE TRAINING IN ALL ASPECTS OF MANAGEMENT IN AGRICULTURE. (3) TO ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION AND ATTAINMENT OF PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATIONS IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF MANAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Farm Office
Redend Farm
Station Road
Pilning
BRISTOL
- Phone:
- 01275843825
- Email:
- victoria@iagrm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window