Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY AND PRESERVATION OF ROMAN MOSAICS

Charity Number: 802883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.06k £3.26k £4.69k £4.44k £18.54k
Total expenditure £5.34k £2.55k £4.20k £4.88k £7.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A