Trustees ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY AND PRESERVATION OF ROMAN MOSAICS

Charity number: 802883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqui Butler Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Dr Norman Foskett Taylor Trustee 03 December 2022
None on record
Dr Jane Chick Trustee 05 December 2020
None on record
DAVID REEVES Trustee 05 December 2020
VECTIS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
BEMBRIDGE FORT TRUST
Received: On time
Adam Ian Blitz Trustee 05 December 2020
None on record
Valerie Pitts Trustee 05 December 2020
None on record
STEPHEN RICHARD CLEWS Trustee 12 March 2012
None on record
Dr PAT WITTS Trustee 03 January 2012
None on record
Dr RUTH CAROLINE WESTGATE MA PHD Trustee
None on record