THE COLCHESTER AND TENDRING COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity making small grants and providing other assistance to voluntary and community organisations operating in Colchester and Tendring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,512 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 23 April 1990: Standard registration
- 15 July 2018: Funds received from 1097865 COLCHESTER CARERS CENTRE
- GRASSROOTS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Ellis | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
James Highton Challinor | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Arthur Needham | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Edward Anthony Bloomfield | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||
David Harris | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
David Paul McLeod | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
COLIN NELSON BENNETT | Trustee | 11 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.67k | £20.55k | £36.38k | £64.06k | £59.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.98k | £34.89k | £22.39k | £37.88k | £88.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £685 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1989 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9TH MARCH 1990 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
A. THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS. B. OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE COMBINED AREA OF THE COLCHESTER BOROUGH COUNCIL AND AREAS ADJACENT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 JAMES CARTER ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO3 9XA
- Phone:
- 07572760849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window