Accounts and annual returns Colchester Engagement & Next Steps Ltd

Charity Number: 803328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 February 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 February 2022 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window