Financial history KNODISHALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 803393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £49.46k £25.44k £12.41k £8.71k £12.86k
Total expenditure £38.83k £11.47k £11.37k £23.45k £15.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.63k £20.65k £2.82k N/A £300