Trustees KNODISHALL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 803393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR D R MURPHY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cope | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbera Cope | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Anne Clements | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Churchyard | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Heather Cracknell | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Winifred Haxell | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|||||
ROBIN JOHN ROBERT PIPE | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR J R MAYHEW | Trustee | 03 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
FLORENCE MARY ROLPH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS L J KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY EDWARD HAXELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE SAXBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.