THE SOCIETY OF THE GUILDFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the orchestra is give the playing member the opportunity to learn and engage with great pieces of music, develop their musical and personal skills as a collective group to perform these works, create performances that will entertain and educate the public, and encourage and inspire young players and performing artists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 July 1990: Standard registration
- GUILDFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JOHN THORPE | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Winterbotham | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Turner | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Merryl Howgate | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Claire Fairhurst | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE ATKINSON | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.90k | £7.48k | £27.51k | £34.74k | £42.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.64k | £6.55k | £31.91k | £32.46k | £44.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JUNE 1990 as amended on 03 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (B) IN PARTICULAR, IN ORDER TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN THE COMMUNITY, TO MAINTAIN THE GUILDFORD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA ("THE ORCHESTRA") FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC AND WORKS AND THE GIVING OF PUBLIC CONCERTS OF SUCH MUSIC AND WORKS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Hillcrest Gardens
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 0BS
- Phone:
- 07779 789208
- Email:
- tim.johnson.gso@sky.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window