THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES OF ENGLAND, WALES, JERSEY, GUERNSEY AND THE ISLE OF MAN

Charity number: 803793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides national coordination for the WI organisation; advances the education of women and girls in important local and national political and social issues, music, drama and other cultural subjects, agriculture, crafts, home economics, science, health and social welfare; promotes sustainable development; advances health and advances citizenship by promoting civic responsibility and volunteering.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • N F W I (Working name)
  • THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES OF ENGLAND, WALES, JERSEY, GUERNSEY AND THE ISLE OF MAN (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natasha Huckle Trustee 24 September 2024
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
JILL RUNDLE Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Anna Mitchell Trustee 29 September 2022
EAST YORKSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES
Received: On time
SEWERBY WOMENS INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Angela Jane Leach Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Pamela Beedan Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
Tracy Baker Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
Paula Pierce Trustee 09 June 2021
None on record
CHRISTINE BOOTH Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
JERYL STONE Trustee 07 June 2017
None on record
Hilary Ruth Haworth Trustee 07 June 2017
None on record
Yvonne Eunice Price Trustee 07 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.94m £4.87m £3.62m £10.03m £3.66m
Total expenditure £7.26m £6.53m £4.54m £4.38m £4.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £224.98k £9.19k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £100.89k £253.98k £62.27k £92.03k £12.87k
Income - Other trading activities £1.76m £1.26m £928.54k £1.02m £983.02k
Income - Charitable activities £4.88m £3.14m £2.48m £8.76m £2.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £204.52k £210.86k £148.91k £157.33k £336.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £13.14k £46.69k £52.54k £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.36m £5.72m £3.86m £3.59m £3.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £892.51k £813.88k £687.37k £792.59k £839.69k
Expenditure - Governance £231.34k £231.34k £0 £201.72k £183.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £2.52m £2.42m £324.74k £321.85k £312.50k
Long-term investments £5.38m £4.17m £4.21m £4.75m £4.18m
Other assets £4.01m £3.47m £4.53m £9.49m £9.46m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.45m £1.15m £640.31k £570.06k £664.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 17 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 13 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 06 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 25TH MARCH 1947, AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 5TH AUGUST 1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, RESIDENTIAL OR OTHERWISE FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE BODY CORPORATE CALLED THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN’S INSTITUTES OF ENGLAND, WALES, JERSEY, GUERNSEY AND THE ISLE OF MAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 November 1998 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
N F W I
104 New Kings Road
LONDON
SW6 4LY
Phone:
02073719300