1ST MONKMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 810284
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Scouting and Guiding Activities to youngsters from the age of 6 to 25.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,596
Total expenditure: £15,077

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 14TH SHREWSBURY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Phillips Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Karen Dyer Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.61k £30.09k £28.65k £16.55k £11.60k
Total expenditure £10.27k £16.85k £14.68k £18.37k £15.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.30k £11.57k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 April 2025 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 April 2025 449 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 April 2025 814 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 April 2025 814 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 April 2025 1179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 April 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
52 ROSEDALE
SHREWSBURY
SY1 4HR
Phone:
01743460321
Website:

No information available