Financial history MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1008295
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.22m £520.95k £26.66k £31.66k £158.75k
Total expenditure £1.78m £1.26m £95.09k £7.59k £8.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.22m £518.05k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £6.17k £2.91k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.26m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.63k £670 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.27k £3.58k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.77m £1.25m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £1.63k £670 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A