WILLEN PAVILION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Willen Pavilion is a local community centre and sports pitches, providing facilities for residents and community organisations to use for the purposes of education, sport, recreation and leisure activities. Our objectives include advancing education and providing facilities in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 18 September 1992: Standard registration
- GRANVILLE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Brunning | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David George William Preston | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Joseph Murphy | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT ALAN KELMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.59k | £30.45k | £51.47k | £25.47k | £35.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.00k | £25.79k | £31.93k | £31.40k | £31.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.65k | £9.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 1 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WILLEN,WILLEN PARK AND BOLBECK PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY).
Area of benefit
WILLEN,WILLEN PARK,BOLBECK PARK, MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willen Pavilion
28 Portland Drive
Willen
MILTON KEYNES
MK15 9JP
- Phone:
- 07985391964
- Email:
- secretary@willenpavilion.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window