LIFEARC

Charity number: 1015243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £128.97m £25.85m £55.18m £992.20m £9.15m
Total expenditure £24.83m £26.55m £30.62m £27.82m £49.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £1.75m N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £105.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £7.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £126.68m £23.10m £52.27m £974.03m £3.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.83m £2.40m £2.50m £5.79m £6.00m
Income - Other £358.00k £355.00k £415.00k £12.37m £20.00k
Income - Legacies £105.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.30m £25.69m £30.01m £26.85m £47.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £438.00k £549.00k £558.00k £976.00k £1.94m
Expenditure - Governance £499.00k £516.00k £467.00k £601.00k £635.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.80m
Expenditure - Investment management £438.00k £549.00k £558.00k £976.00k £1.42m
Expenditure - Other £93.00k £312.00k £57.00k £0 £0