INTERNATIONAL THEATRE EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1016471
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £528 £427 £576 £1.37k £526
Total expenditure £527 £887 £714 £1.32k £870