BRADBURY DAY CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of builings/facilities for elderly/old people/children/young people/people with disabilities/other charities or valuntary bodies and the general public/mankind
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 28 May 1993: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CASBOLT | Chair | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hollins | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Kerr | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Rogers | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.80k | £200 | £4.30k | £6.50k | £5.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £702 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY IN NORTH SHROPSHIRE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY CARE CENTRE
Area of benefit
NORTH SHROPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornfield House
Cottesloe Ridge
Chester Avenue
WHITCHURCH
SY13 1NN
- Phone:
- 07889594517
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window