CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU

Charity number: 1034245
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)