CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU

Charity number: 1034245
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.03m £32.88m £34.42m £33.72m £34.20m
Other income £19.67m £16.99m £16.77m £16.52m £18.17m
Total expenditure £51.84m £51.48m £50.86m £48.50m £49.10m