CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU

Charity number: 1034245
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sarah Younan Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Kate Alice Eden Trustee 01 April 2017
PRIFYSGOL ABERYSTWYTH Charity reporting is up to date
Phillip George Chair 01 April 2016 None on record
Andrew James Miller MBE Trustee 08 May 2012
WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND Charity reporting is up to date
DAFYDD GWYN RHYS Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Lhosa Anne Daly FRSA Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Victoria Mary Provis MBA Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Gwennan Mair Jones Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Alison Mears Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Devinda Rennie De Silva Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
MARIAN WYN JONES BA HONS Trustee 08 May 2012
CANOLFAN GERDD WILLIAM MATHIAS CYF Charity reporting is up to date
BANGOR UNIVERSITY Charity reporting is up to date
SIR KYFFIN WILLIAMS TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MR MICHAEL GRIFFITHS OBE Trustee 08 May 2012 None on record
Iwan Bala Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record
Yr Athro Tudur Hallam BA PhD Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Andrew Robert Eagle Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record