Trustees THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR NICHOLAS ANDREW SEROTA Chair 01 February 2017
None on record
Annabel Turpin Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Sally Shaw MBE Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
David Bryan CBE Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Deborah Shaw Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Veronica Wadley CBE Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Abigail Pogson Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
YolanDa Brown OBE Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
William Bush Trustee 15 May 2022
CIVIC FUTURE
Recently registered
Helen Birchenough Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Murdoch Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
DAVID PAUL ROBERTS Trustee 01 December 2017
None on record
SUKHBINDER SINGH JOHAL Trustee 01 December 2017
BLACK ENVIRONMENT NETWORK
Overdue by 111 days
Andrew James Miller MBE Trustee 01 December 2017
THE ROYAL SHAKESPEARE COMPANY, STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF FILM AND TELEVISION ARTS
Received: On time