THE OGDEN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the charity are to increase the uptake of physics post-16, particularly for under-represented groups, by supporting the teaching of physics, and supporting students to develop physics identity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£796,428
Donations and legacies | £58.65k | |
Charitable activities | £212.59k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £525.19k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,266,970
Raising funds | £372.71k | |
Charitable activities | £2.89m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,541,074 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £372.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.89m |
People
16 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 May 1994: Standard registration
- 26 February 2024: Funds received from 1080879 SPACELINK LEARNING FOUNDATION
- OGDEN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAMERON OGDEN | Chair |
|
||||||
Timothy Simmons | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LADY OGDEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
TIFFANY CATHERINE ROSE CHAWNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR PETER JAMES OGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD PETER JAMES OGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.45k | £324.40k | £503.33k | £600.23k | £796.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.54m | £2.85m | £2.34m | £2.35m | £3.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.94k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £5.14k | £23.62k | £58.65k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £79.16k | £212.59k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £370.67k | £479.24k | £525.19k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £127.52k | £18.20k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.96m | £2.04m | £2.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £379.03k | £303.17k | £372.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.20k | £28.47k | £11.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £535.20k | £525.65k | £716.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £379.03k | £303.17k | £372.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £2.25k | £0 | £24.13k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £60.23m | £65.80m | £64.57m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £233.79k | £197.19k | £367.19k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £988.51k | £693.71k | £586.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18TH MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 JUN 2022 as amended on 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE; AND (III) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ogden Trust
Phoenix Brewery
13 Bramley Road
LONDON
W10 6SZ
- Phone:
- 0208 634 7470
- Email:
- office@ogdentrust.com
- Website:
-
ogdentrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window