BOURNEMOUTH CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Chamber Music Concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
Governance
- 20 May 1994: Standard registration
- B C M S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL MARGARET WHITE | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christina Thomas | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Date | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Colvin | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ros Horsfall-Turner | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Butterworth | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE RICKETS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.83k | £1.05k | £14.00k | £14.05k | £11.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.11k | £451 | £10.93k | £18.34k | £15.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 2010 as amended on 30 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,IMPROVE,DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALLL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BOURNEMOUTH AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Ribbonwood Heights
Blair Avenue
POOLE
POOLE
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01202 745516
- Email:
- rose.allen@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window