LIVING WATERS RADIO MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds in the UK to support the production of Christian broadcast and social media material by a production team in India and to support follow-up by the production team. Support Christian activities in association with this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 10 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT SCOTT-COOK | Chair | 20 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JULIAN PAUL MARSH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr PAUL DANIEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MARK MOLYNEUX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £10.62k | £9.86k | £9.37k | £12.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.28k | £9.27k | £6.34k | £6.93k | £3.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 2) TO CONDUCT AND/OR SUPPORT EVANGELICAL AND RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE WORK ALONE, OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH, OR BY MEANS OF CHURCHES, CHAPELS, MISSIONS, MISSIONARIES, MISSION SOCIETIES AND OTHER RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 3) TO ENGAGE IN, SUPPORT AND WORK WITH THESE ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN GOSPEL BROADCASTING, FOLLOW UP WORK, LITERATURE, PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION. 4) TO ASSIST IN THE ADVANCING OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGH THE MEANS OF PUBLICATIONS, RECORDS, TAPE RECORDINGS, FILMS AND FILM STRIPS, VIDEO RECORDINGS, BROADCASTING BY RADIO AND TELEVISION OR OTHER MEANS. 5) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS BEING CHARITABLE AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GREAT BRITAIN AND ALL OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CEDAR WAY
PORTISHEAD
BRISTOL
BS20 6TT
- Phone:
- 01275848770
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window