THE LEICESTERSHIRE TRUST FOR THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY BUNGALOWS FOR DISABLED PERSONS

Charity number: 1043859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide first class holiday accommodation in two leasehold bungalows for persons who are disabled by reason of sickness, injury or ill health whose chief or main residence is in the East Midlands.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,477
Total expenditure: £17,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID PETER CORAH Chair
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FRAMEWORK KNITTERS EDUCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
THE J REGINALD CORAH FOUNDATION FUND
Received: On time
ELIZABETH CUMMING Trustee 17 June 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.00k £13.34k £13.49k £15.27k £17.48k
Total expenditure £14.99k £13.50k £21.50k £18.50k £17.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
41 The Nook
Whissendine
Oakham
LE15 7EZ
Phone:
01664474525
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available