Our Bolton NHS Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides patients amenities and extras to help make a patients treatment a better experience, additional and up to date medical and surgical equipment is purchased for diagnosis and treatment. Staff are able to enhance their knowledge through the provision of training and education whilst treating patients with the most up to date technology available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 November 2001: Standard registration
- 10 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BOLTON HOSPITALS NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- BOLTON HOSPITALS NHS TRUST ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- BOLTON NHS CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- ROYAL BOLTON HOSPITAL CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOLTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £725.00k | £582.00k | £353.00k | £724.00k | £271.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £543.00k | £517.00k | £387.00k | £753.00k | £595.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £678.00k | £581.00k | N/A | £697.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.00k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.00k | £1.00k | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £34.00k | £0 | N/A | £19.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £526.00k | £56.00k | N/A | £556.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £542.00k | £517.00k | N/A | £734.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.00k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £33.00k | £74.00k | N/A | £84.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £19.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/09/2011 as amended on 27 May 2021
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BOLTON CORONARY CARE APPEAL
- BOLTON HOSPITALS ARTS PROJECT
- BOLTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- FALL BIRCH HOSPITAL GENERAL PURPOSES CHARITY
- HULTON HOSPITAL GENERAL PURPOSES FUND
- ROYAL BOLTON HOSPITAL GENERAL PURPOSES CHARITY
- THE EDUCATION FUND FOR STUDENT NURSES AND NURSING STAFF AT BOLTON NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
- 01 November 2001 : Standard registration
- 10 March 2011 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal Bolton Hospital
Minerva Road
Farnworth
Bolton
BL4 0JR
- Phone:
- 01204390048
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window