Financial history THE BRITISH COUNCIL

Charity number: 209131
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.17bn £1.25bn £1.29bn £924.97m £896.66m
Total expenditure £1.17bn £1.22bn £1.30bn £1.02bn £942.31m
Income from government contracts £55.32m £40.85m £42.05m £30.90m £74.10m
Income from government grants £169.28m £223.84m £236.69m £182.19m £206.65m
Income - Donations and legacies £168.28m £184.23m £186.70m £144.50m £183.44m
Income - Other trading activities £906.53k £872.67k £578.42k £322.87k £287.35k
Income - Charitable activities £994.58m £1.06bn £1.09bn £762.36m £706.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.84m £2.71m £3.38m £2.21m £1.49m
Income - Other £5.73m £3.78m £9.05m £15.57m £5.31m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16bn £1.20bn £1.28bn £1.01bn £935.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.22k £204.29k £44.94k £69.47k £44.15k
Expenditure - Governance £9.08m £17.89m £11.80m £7.24m £7.67m
Expenditure - Grants institution £166.83m £19.61m £228.03m £208.88m £103.86m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £10.16m £15.68m £13.70m £6.81m £7.04m