THE VANGUARD TRUST FOR ASSISTING DISABLED EX-SERVICEMEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of housing at low rents and other assistance to physically disabled or financially disadvantaged ex-servicemen and ex-servicewomen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 20 February 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 February 2019: Funds transferred to 210063 ROYAL BRITISH LEGION INDUSTRIES LTD.
- VANGUARD TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.45k | £30.28k | £29.29k | £31.39k | £32.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.31k | £18.34k | £39.59k | £18.11k | £22.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 12 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 12 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 12 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 30 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 30 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1928 (U.V.239.P.559-571) AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 8TH FEBRUARY 1952.
Charitable objects
TO ERECT OR PROVIDE COTTAGES AT LOW RENTS OR OTHERWISE ASSIST DISABLED EX-SERVICEMEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window