ROCHFORD CHARITIES

Charity number: 210524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 November 2020 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 November 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required