THE SIR JACK LYONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of education, humanitarian causes and performing arts, particularly in Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 December 1962: Standard registration
- THE I J LYONS CHARITABLE TRUST OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE SIR JACK LYONS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID STEPHEN LYONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fergus Beadle | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jackson | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA LYONS-NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mortimer James Friedman FCA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.06k | £112.37k | £99.00k | £152.77k | £171.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.88k | £194.82k | £206.92k | £224.23k | £203.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH DECEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 7 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNFETTERED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRESHAM HOUSE
5-7 ST. PAULS STREET
LEEDS
LS1 2JG
- Phone:
- 01132976789
- Email:
- p.mitchell@sagars.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window