CHARDON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Essentially the Trust operates the Llandudno Museum and also has the powers to provide educational facilities at the Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 17 May 1963: Standard registration
- 16 November 2016: Funds received from 1066187 LLANDUDNO SEASIDE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST
- RAPALLO HOUSE MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Huw Pritchard | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Judith Phillips | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hilary Claire Kewley | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Oliver MBE | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Philip Charles Evans JP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £768.83k | £417.64k | £148.13k | £120.39k | £59.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.21k | £97.11k | £73.22k | £146.16k | £105.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £298.03k | £121.44k | £10.00k | £25.81k | £10.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £766.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £46.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/04/1988 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC A) OF A COLLECTION OF FINE ART AND APPLIED ARTS AND CRAFTS SO AS TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN ART AND APPRECIATION OF ART AND B) OF COLLECTIONS OF ARTEFACTS AND NATURAL EXHIBITS SO AS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY AND ECONOMY OF LLANDUDNO AND ITS EVIRONS.
Area of benefit
LLANDUDNO AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llandudno Museum
17-19 Gloddaeth Street
Llandudno
LL30 2DD
- Phone:
- 01492876517
- Email:
- info@llandudnomuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window