YORK DISPENSARY SICK POOR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals and organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
Governance
- 13 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helen Patricia Vos | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Bradshaw | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Imogen Hall | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Peers Holloway | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gregory Gowar | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN MARGARET HAYNES | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicola Edwards | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.08k | £20.97k | £19.24k | £20.57k | £20.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.58k | £24.17k | £22.29k | £23.19k | £22.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 7 JUNE 1955. ORDER OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE (CHANCERY DIVISION) 10 FEBRUARY 1958. SCHEME OF 5 NOVEMBER 1974. as amended on 01 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS.
Area of benefit
YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairfield
The Mile
Pocklington
YORK
YO42 1TW
- Phone:
- 01904634771
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window