WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED

Charity number: 221538
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 September 2020 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 September 2020 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 23 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 26 April 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)