THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 225922
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £376.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.37m £549.00k £0 £109.00k £60.00k
Other income £9.00m £8.41m £8.21m £8.30m £8.88m
Total expenditure £8.74m £9.51m £8.39m £8.28m £8.41m