THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 225922
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jake Ferguson Trustee 16 March 2020 None on record
Kiran Kaur Trustee 16 March 2020 None on record
JULIE BENTLEY Trustee 20 November 2017 None on record
Paul Breckell Trustee 19 November 2018 None on record
Dr PRIYA SINGH Chair 23 November 2020 None on record
Paul Buchanan Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Emily Agius Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Sheila Taylor MBE Trustee 18 November 2019
DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Ingrid Tennessee Trustee 19 November 2018 None on record
Dr Sarabajaya Kumar Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Anne Heal Trustee 16 November 2015
BALLETBOYZ LTD Charity reporting is up to date
VOLUNTEERING MATTERS Charity reporting is up to date
DAN SUTCH Trustee 14 September 2018 None on record