THE EDMUND GODSON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of the trust is to assist poor residents of certain parishes in the following areas to start new careers in other countries: Woolwich Shinfield and Spencer's Wood, Berkshire Tenbury Wells, Worcestershire Northeast Herefordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Herefordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
- Worcestershire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 April 1964: Standard registration
- THE EDMOND GODSON CHARITY (Working name)
- GODSON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FREYA VILLIS | Chair | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dominic Mbang | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Andrew Oughton | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elaine Kirkland Padwick | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev MICHAEL JOHN KNEEN | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
WILLIAM ROGERS | Trustee | 10 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £11.42k | £14.77k | £17.27k | £16.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.36k | £6.74k | £8.23k | £9.57k | £13.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
HIGH COURT SCHEME OF THE 13TH MAY 1957 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 8 FEBRUARY 1982, SCHEME DATED 17 APRIL 2000, ORDER DATED 29 JUNE 2006 AND RESOLUTION DATED 22 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS FOLLOWS: (A) BY ASSISTING THEM TO EMIGRATE; OR (B) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS CONTAINED IN CLAUSE 2 OF THE SCHEME DATED 8 FEBRUARY 1982. AREA OF BENEFIT BEING: A PERSON RESIDING OR CARRYING ON BUSINESS IN ANY OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF:PENCOWE WITH MARSTON, STANNETT, PUDDLESTON CUM WHYLE, LEOMINSTER, ST MARY THE VIRGIN, MIDDLETON ON THE HILL, ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS TENBURY AND TENBURY WELLS IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER; ST MARY,SHINFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE; AND ALL SAINTS ELTHAM, ALL SAINTS SHOOTERS HILL, THE CHURCH OF THE ASCENSION PLUMSTEAD, THE GOOD SHEPHERD WITH ST PETER LEE, HOLY TRINITY ELTHAM, ST BARNABAS ELTHAM, ST JAMES KIDBROOKE, ST JOHN WITH ST JAMES AND ST PAUL PLUMSTEAD, ST LUKE ELTHAM PARK, ST LUKE WITH HOLY TRINITY CHARLTON, ST MARK AND ST MARGARET PLUMSTEAD, ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS WOOLWICH, ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS ABBEY WOOD, ST NICHOLAS PLUMSTEAD, ST SAVIOUR ELTHAM AND ST THOMAS WOOLWICH IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH.
Area of benefit
PLEASE SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 HEMINGFORD ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3BZ
- Phone:
- 07866267692
- Email:
- info@edmundgodson.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window