WATNALL (NOTTS) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meeting of members providing speakers, craft activities and social events in the Watnall area of Nottingham. Also a hall for activities for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
- WATNALL W I (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE WIDDOWSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marilyn Mason Mrs | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET STONE | Trustee | 22 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET BARKER | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Patience Rose | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARION ELIZABETH MONKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.32k | £19.59k | £9.53k | £15.09k | £14.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £10.73k | £15.11k | £10.65k | £11.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED) AND ORDER OF 22 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
WATNALL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Bass Close
Linby
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 8JW
- Phone:
- 01159634572
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window