THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - BEDFORD BRANCH

Charity number: 231568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

COLLECTION OF DONATIONS, LEGACIES, GRANTS, MEMBERS SUBSCRIPTIONS FOR THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AID AND OTHER SUPPORT TO EX AND CURRENT MEMBERS OF THE RAF

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,813
Total expenditure: £11,758

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leslie Norman Fishman Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Raymond John Rowland Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Suckvinder Jdali Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Mark Salisbury Trustee 22 May 2024
None on record
Jason Hollamby Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Councillor Andrea Spice Trustee 27 March 2024
TAVISTOCK COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BEDFORD PARK
Received: On time
BEDFORD MAYOR'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Petra Mackenzie Trustee 17 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.92k £43.62k £7.82k £20.00k £9.81k
Total expenditure £36.36k £49.17k £4.20k £19.00k £11.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
93 Ashburnham Road
Bedford
Bedfordshire
MK40 1EA
Phone:
01234 350107
Email:
No information available
Website:

rafa-bedford.org.uk