CHARITY OF GEORGE COX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity assesses requests from various agencies regarding people living in street who need financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 March 1965: Standard registration
- COX'S CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANASTASIA LAWRENCE | Chair | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Pengelly | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Howiantz | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Martin | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERRY NAPPER | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
sonia beaty | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE APPLEBY | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.12k | £3.32k | £3.63k | £4.06k | £4.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60k | £5.04k | £2.37k | £3.13k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 29TH APRIL 1985 as amended on 12 Nov 2018 as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF STREET WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STREET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mission Church
Vestry Road
Street
Somerset
BA16 0HZ
- Phone:
- 01458442671
- Email:
- churchoffice8@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window