SIR ROBERT DRURY'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small, ancient charity whose income is used to promote the work of the Philip Metalfe Alms Houses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 June 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HOLLIDAY | Chair |
|
||||||||
Stephen Scott | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Harrison | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
ALAN MICHAEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MALCOLM CORNWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137 | £137 | £137 | £137 | £147 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 August 2024 | 277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE OF FEOFFMENT DATED 18TH MARCH 1910 COMPRISED IN HIGH COURT ORDER OF 20TH JANUARY 1930 AND SCHEMES OF 17TH APRIL 1931 AND 11TH FEBRUARY 1977
Charitable objects
A YEARLY SUM OF $22 FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR PRSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. SUBJECT AS AFORESAID THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO PHILIP METCALFE'S ALMSHOUSES (234453).
Area of benefit
BROCKLEY, CHEDBURGH, HAWSTEAD, REDE AND WHEPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FIRS
CHURCH ROAD
PINFORD END
HAWSTEAD
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP29 5PE
- Phone:
- 01284388267
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window