THE SOVEREIGN GRACE UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The extension of the awareness of the truth of the Bible and its teaching by the publication and circulation of relevent literature, and the arranging of public meetings. The charity makes grants of selected study books to students at Bible Colleges, Theological Seminaries etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 1966: Standard registration
- SGU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN DENIS SMITH | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy Martin | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHALAN HETHERINGTON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HUMPHREY | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
|||||
GERVASE CHARMLEY | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | £8.46k | £7.80k | £8.74k | £5.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44k | £10.36k | £12.64k | £20.83k | £12.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2022 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRINTED BASIS AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE PROCLAMATION AND DEFENCE OF THE DOCTRINES OF FREE AND SOVEREIGN GRACE. TO PRINT AND REPRINT LITERATURE EXPOUNDING SUCH DOCTRINES. TO ENCOURAGE PUBLISHERS TO ISSUE SUCH LITERATURE, AND TO HELP ITS CIRCULATION BY PURCHASE AND DISTRIBUTION TO CLERGY, MINISTERS, THEOLOGICAL STUDENT, MEMBERS OF PARLIAMENT AND OTHERS. (FOR FURTHERDETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF BASIS AND RULES).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Warwick Road
RAYLEIGH
Essex
SS6 8PQ
- Phone:
- 01268775041
- Email:
- chris.ba@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window