FORCES WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See Report and Accounts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 June 1967: Standard registration
- 06 January 1995: Removed
- CHURCH OF ENGLAND BOARD FOR THE WELFARE OF HER MAJESTY'S FORCES WITHIN THE DIOCESE OF SALISBURY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Jackman | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev Mark Robert Christian | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Gary James Birch | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lt Col Andrew Ledger OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Alexander Goodwin | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lt Col Daniel John Rawlins | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Dr Lydia Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Shimmen | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Group Captain Michael Geoffrey Oldham | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Stephen Robbins | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lt Col Mark John Robert Nash | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jane Guyer | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Lt Col Richard Miller | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.09k | £40.89k | £41.18k | £42.83k | £45.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.07k | £54.76k | £34.30k | £18.60k | £16.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 9 JULY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 DECEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
IN PROMOTING THE SPIRITUAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF AND PROVIDING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BENEFITS AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE FOR HER MAJESTY'S FORCES WITHIN THE DIOCESES OF SALISBURY AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF SALISBURY
Linked charities
- 02 June 1967 : Standard registration
- 06 January 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seniors Farmhouse
Semley
Shaftesbury
SP7 9AX
- Phone:
- 01747850194
- Email:
- mtdbutler@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window