Accounts and annual returns ENGLISH NATIONAL OPERA

Charity number: 257210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 01 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window