DOLPHIN SWIMMING CLUB FOR HANDICAPPED PERSONS

Charity number: 265658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Swimming for people with special needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 03 October 2023

Total income: £1,231
Total expenditure: £574

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DOLPHIN SWIMMING CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Ernest RANDALL Chair 20 January 2022
None on record
Julie Patricia RANDALL Trustee 20 January 2022
None on record
Noel FRAREY Trustee 20 January 2022
THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING CLUBS FOR THE HANDICAPPED (N A S C H )
Received: On time
Darren Keith VICKERS Trustee 20 January 2022
None on record
WENDY STUTKINS Trustee 12 November 2016
None on record
Julian Richards Trustee 16 November 2014
None on record
TRACEY KITCHING Trustee
THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SWIMMING CLUBS FOR THE HANDICAPPED (N A S C H )
Received: On time
DAVID EDWIN WALL Trustee
THE LINKAGE GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2019 03/10/2020 03/10/2021 03/10/2022 03/10/2023
Total gross income £1.60k £958 £0 £2.31k £1.23k
Total expenditure £1.21k £502 £150 £682 £574
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 October 2023 05 August 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2022 09 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2021 19 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2020 09 August 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
99 BIGGLESWADE ROAD
UPPER CALDECOTE
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 9BH
Phone:
01767315586
Website:

stevenage-dolphins.org