WESTON-SUPER-MARE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 266344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As shown in other boxes below

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,721
Total expenditure: £7,743

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman Alec Sharples Chair 30 September 2020
None on record
Cara Mary Elizabeth MacMahon MA Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Gary John McKenzie Trustee 08 April 2024
None on record
Dominic James Wells Trustee 08 April 2024
None on record
Kim Lorraine Chilcott Trustee 11 April 2022
None on record
Alan Stuart Rice Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
John Daniel Martel Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
PETER JOHN BARRINGTON Trustee 28 April 2014
THE WOODSPRING TALKING NEWS
Received: On time
Dr DAVID J L AGASSIZ Trustee 30 April 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.80k £6.73k £8.13k £8.61k £7.72k
Total expenditure £13.50k £1.74k £12.70k £14.87k £7.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FLAT A
6 Ellenborough Crescent
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 1XL
Phone:
07951 165120
Website:

westoncivicsociety.org.uk