THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £503.33m £604.75m £597.74m £614.30m £706.32m
Total expenditure £431.55m £516.27m £482.51m £626.33m £683.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £188.00k £1.92m £1.10m
Income - Donations and legacies £466.60m £560.56m £550.89m £565.03m £654.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £20.05m £25.05m £26.50m £28.04m £28.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.68m £19.14m £20.34m £21.24m £22.68m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £35.46m £23.88m £33.56m £16.92m £21.70m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £431.55m £516.27m £482.51m £626.33m £683.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £542.00k £1.18m £1.38m £1.49m £1.42m
Expenditure - Grants institution £402.47m £480.90m £446.08m £587.90m £640.46m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0