THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 01 January 1974: Standard registration
  • 10 January 2013: Funds received from 271003 THE EDWARD AND LOIS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 03 June 2013: Funds received from 1091648 THE CHARITY BANK LIMITED
  • 20 January 2014: Funds received from 326291 THE MICHAEL C GOODWIN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
  • 03 February 2014: Funds received from 256205 RABY CHARITY TRUST
  • 25 September 2014: Funds received from 1143544 AHMED SARODI TRUST
  • 26 November 2014: Funds received from 288968 WILLIAM P BANCROFT NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 13 February 2015: Funds received from 1063082 THE BONUS TRUST
  • 25 June 2015: Funds received from 1146285 CROSS STREET (CHARITABLE) FOUNDATION
  • 01 June 2016: Funds received from 326607 THE WOLSELEY-HUGHES CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 11 April 2017: Funds received from 1107255 MEDIVET ANIMAL TRUST
  • 05 May 2017: Funds received from 326694 THE ELLISON MARSDEN CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CAF (Working name)
  • GAYE (Working name)
  • GIVE AS YOU EARN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property