CARHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a village hall we offer a safe, comfortable building for parishoners etc. to hire for meetings, recreational pursuits, parties etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 30 July 1975: Standard registration
- CARHAMPTON VILLAGE ROOM (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE DYER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
kay cheesman | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID LESLIE HUTCHINS | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH NORTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN ALICE CRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILLIP JAMES MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN RONALD LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.08k | £17.24k | £13.44k | £13.01k | £12.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.22k | £12.09k | £7.42k | £11.54k | £10.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | £2.67k | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1913 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 13TH JANUARY 1986
Charitable objects
FOR MEETING READING RECREATION AND OTHER SIMILA PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
CARHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE FIRS
CARANTOC PLACE
CARHAMPTON
MINEHEAD
TA24 6NE
- Phone:
- 01643822274
- Email:
- judithnorton@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window