THE LIONEL ABEL-SMITH TRUST

Charity number: 274879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 24 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download